This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 01/25/2022 at 10:06:41 (UTC).

P M BARAN VS PROGRESSIVE

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 P M BARAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Trustees

BARAN PAMELA M

BARAN PAMELA M TRUST

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Co Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Trustee Attorney

KRAPF GRANT W

2790 Sunset Point Rd

Clearwater, FL 33759-1503

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/18/2021: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/18/2021: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/18/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/18/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/19/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

12/27/2021: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S208799; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 138803842; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: KRAPF GRANT W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S208799; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 138803842; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: KRAPF GRANT W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docket(#7) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docket(#6) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRANT W KRAPF, ESQ