This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/28/2020 at 10:17:52 (UTC).

P L TILLMAN VS R M TILLMAN

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 P L TILLMAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against R M TILLMAN. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TILLMAN PAULA L

Melbourne, FL 32935-5035

Respondent

TILLMAN ROGER M

Melbourne, FL 32935-5035

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RIDDLE MARIA A

1334 Valentine St

Melbourne, FL 32901-3128

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: VS CLERKS DSB; Amount: -5.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: VS CLERKS DSB FEE; Amount: -4.51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: CIVIL SUSPENSE; Amount: 10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketVITAL STATISTIC FORM GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:15 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docket(#13) FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163403; Party: PT 1; Event Description: PMT: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: $409.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: PAULA TILLMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#6) DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#5) DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#4) MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#2) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#1) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: RSGN: DOM TO COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Judge: C SERRANO - GM L CASTALDI; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less