This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/06/2020 at 08:57:50 (UTC).

P JENKINS VS TOWER HILL PRIME

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 P JENKINS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TOWER HILL PRIME. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE B. TURNER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE B. TURNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENKINS PATRICIA

Defendant

TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY

Chief Financial Officer, 200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CIOCCHETTI MICHAEL

1020 W International Speedway Blvd Ste 100

Daytona Beach, FL 32114-3447

Defendant Attorney

PASTIS ADAM M

485 N Keller Rd Ste 401

Maitland, FL 32751-7575

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

03/25/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

03/20/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/16/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/24/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

COVER SHEET

11/25/2019: COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/25/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/25/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158239; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MICHAEL CIOCCHETTI PLL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158239; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MICHAEL CIOCCHETTI PLL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less