This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/12/2020 at 08:08:43 (UTC).

OLEANDER POINTE VS BROWN

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 OLEANDER POINTE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against BROWN. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLEANDER POINTE YACHT CLUB CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

BROWN INSURANCE SERVICES

1418 W 23Rd St Suite 200

Panama City, FL 32405-2904

HANCOCK JW JAY

Panama City, FL 32405-2904

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARKER SHAUN J

222 Lakeview Ave Ste 950

West Palm Beach, FL 33401-6173

Defendant Attorney

SIMPSON DANIELLE M

1900 Summit Tower Boulevard, Tower Place Suite 400

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

INTERROGATORIES

11/07/2019: INTERROGATORIES

INTERROGATORIES

11/07/2019: INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/08/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/08/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/07/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/07/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/07/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/07/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/07/2019: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/30/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/30/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

01/24/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/30/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/05/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/05/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

11/25/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

11/25/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/07/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • Docket(#31) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Docket(#24) ORDER EXTENDING TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: INSURANCE CLAIM; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less