This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/28/2023 at 04:05:21 (UTC).

O AWOBUSUYI VS DR HORTON

Case Summary

On 12/08/2022 O AWOBUSUYI filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against DR HORTON. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT BLAUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT BLAUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AWOBUSUYI OLUWASEUN

AWOBUDUYI OLUBUKOLA

Defendants

D R HORTON INC

ALL PRO STUCCO CENTRAL FLORIDA INC

MAGICAL HANDS CLEANING PAINTING SERVICES INC

84 LUMBER COMPANY LP

HUNT SONS ENTERPRISES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBRIEN NEIL PATRICK

Defendant Attorneys

SANDOR KELSEY M

GROSSHANS JOSHUA D

GENTRY BERNARD H JR

MULLIGAN JEREMIAH

BAGGE KELLY CAREY

SMITH MARK A

BARLOW JAMES M J

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/11/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

01/12/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

01/12/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

01/12/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/11/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/11/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/22/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/22/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

12/14/2022: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/04/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/01/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/01/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

04/07/2023: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

04/06/2023: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/23/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

03/08/2023: NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

03/08/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/02/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2023
  • Docket(#30) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: B213292; Party: D 4; Event Description: PMT: CIR CROSS-COUNTER-3RD PTY; Amount: $395.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: CAREY OMALLEY WHITAKER MUELLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: CONSTRUCTION DEFECT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • Docket(#2) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: CONSTRUCTION DEFECT; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less