This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/28/2020 at 09:58:42 (UTC).

NEWREZ VS STACI L NELSON

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 NEWREZ filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against STACI L NELSON. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE B. TURNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE B. TURNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEWREZ LLC

SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING

Defendants

NELSON STACI L MR

Rockledge, FL 32955-4500

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Rockledge, FL 32955-4500

UNITED STATES AMERICA DEPARTMENT TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE

400 N Tampa St, Co Us Attorney

Tampa, FL 33602-4719

TUCKAWAY LAKE ESTATES INC

C/O Tucker, Gilbert A, 4125 South Fiske Blvd

Rockledge, FL 32955

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Rockledge, FL 32955-4500

NELSON STACI L

Rockledge, FL 32955-4500

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHURCH KELLEY L

255 S Orange Ave Ste 900

Orlando, FL 32801-3454

Defendant Attorney

RUDY JOHN F 3

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ACTION

03/24/2020: NOTICE OF ACTION

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

03/24/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

03/19/2020: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

03/18/2020: DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT

03/13/2020: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT

CERTIFICATE OF FILING

03/13/2020: CERTIFICATE OF FILING

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/28/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/28/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/28/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

01/31/2020: MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

COVER SHEET

01/31/2020: COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

01/31/2020: LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: FCL-HOMESTEAD $50001-$249999; Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less