This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/12/2023 at 16:01:10 (UTC).

NEWREZ VS M PATRIACCA

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 NEWREZ filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against M PATRIACCA. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURT JACOBUS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURT JACOBUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEWREZ LLC

SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING

Defendants

PATRIACCA MARIA C

PATRIACCA MARIA C MR

BANK AMERICA NA

BOARD COUNTY COMMISSIONERS BREVARD COUNTY FLORIDA

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERGER CHASE A

Defendant Attorney

BEAZLEY SARAH

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

01/26/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

01/25/2023: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/14/2023: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/24/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

03/06/2023: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

ORDER GRANTING MOTION OR PETITION

03/03/2023: ORDER GRANTING MOTION OR PETITION

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/15/2023: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/14/2023: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/14/2023: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S247407; Party: P 1; Memo: EF 170765282; Event Description: PMT: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: $18.50; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: NEWREZ LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketASM: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: 18.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER GRANTING MOTION OR PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF NOTE IN POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: FCL-HOMESTEAD $50001-$249999; Judge: CURT JACOBUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less