This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/07/2020 at 08:16:59 (UTC).

NEWREZ LLC VS JOHN GROTH

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 NEWREZ LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against JOHN GROTH. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES H EARP. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES H EARP

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEWREZ LLC

SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING

NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Palm Bay, FL 32909-2337

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Palm Bay, FL 32909-2337

GROTH JOHN

Palm Bay, FL 32909-2337

BROOKSIDE BAYSIDE LAKES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

2180 W State Road 434 Ste 5000

Longwood, FL 32779-5042

SANTOS-GROTH JAZMIN MR

Palm Bay, FL 32909-2337

SECRETARY HOUSING URBAN DEVELOPMENT

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200, C/O Robert E Oneill

Tampa, FL 33602-4774

GROTH JOHN MS

Palm Bay, FL 32909-2337

SANTOS-GROTH JAZMIN

Palm Bay, FL 32909-2337

UNITED STATE AMERICA

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602-4798

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANDERS REENA PATEL

10360 W State Road 84

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33324-4237

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

11/25/2019: LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

COVER SHEET

11/25/2019: COVER SHEET

MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

11/25/2019: MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S161788; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: $18.50; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: JASON MICHAEL VANSLETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S161788; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4; Amount: $5.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: JASON MICHAEL VANSLETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketASM: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4; Amount: 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketASM: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: 18.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158222; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT:FCL >50,000 < 250,000; Amount: $906.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: JASON MICHAEL VANSLETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158222; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $79.11; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: JASON MICHAEL VANSLETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158222; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4; Amount: $5.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: JASON MICHAEL VANSLETT

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF NOTE IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: FCL-HOMESTEAD $50001-$249999; Judge: JAMES H EARP; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less