This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 11/14/2021 at 10:30:12 (UTC).

NEWREZ LLC VS BRUCE KWITNY

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 NEWREZ LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against BRUCE KWITNY. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEWREZ LLC

SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING

Defendants

KWITNY BRUCE A

Melbourne, FL 32940-6956

SUNTREE MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

7550 Spyglass Hill Rd

Melbourne, FL 32940-7901

SPRINGS SUNTREE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

8300 Holiday Springs Rd

Melbourne, FL 32940-6933

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

100 Shockoe Slip Fl 2

Richmond, VA 23219-4100

WACHOVIA BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

100 Shockoe Slip Fl 2

Richmond, VA 23219-4100

UNITED STATES AMERICA

C/O Us Attorney'S Office Middle District Of Fl, 400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602-4774

KWITNY LISA B

Melbourne, FL 32940-1618

TENANT 1 UNKNOWN

Melbourne, FL 32940-6956

TENANT 2 UNKNOWN

Melbourne, FL 32940-6956

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIAZ ROY A

499 Nw 70Th Ave Ste 309

Plantation, FL 33317-7574

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: B209548; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS; Amount: $2.89; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: DIAZ ANSELMO ASSOCIATES PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: B209548; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $23.11; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: DIAZ ANSELMO ASSOCIATES PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S204571; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4; Amount: $7.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHD LEGAL GROUP PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S204571; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $56.89; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHD LEGAL GROUP PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S204571; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT:FCL >50,000 < 250,000; Amount: $906.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHD LEGAL GROUP PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S204571; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS; Amount: $7.11; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHD LEGAL GROUP PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S204571; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: LIS PENDENS TWO PAGES; Amount: $9.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHD LEGAL GROUP PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: FCL-HOMESTEAD $50001-$249999; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPRINGS SUNTREE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNTREE MASTER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases where Wachovia Bank, National Assn is a litigant