This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 09/08/2020 at 12:09:50 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR VS HOMER BRANTLEY

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 NATIONSTAR filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against HOMER BRANTLEY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY

Defendants

BRANTLEY TYRIS DEVON

Melbourne, FL 32901

UNITED STATES AMERICA

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602-4774

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Melbourne, FL 32901-7130

BRANTLEY HOMER LEE ESTATE

BRANTLEY HOMER L MRS

506 Walker St

Melbourne, FL 32901-7130

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Melbourne, FL 32901-7130

UNKNOWN HEIRS

Melbourne, FL 32901-7130

SECRETARY HOUSING URBAN DEVELOPMENT

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602-4774

BRANTLEY HOMER LEE MRS

506 Walker St

Melbourne, FL 32901-7130

BRANTLEY HOMER L ESTATE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON CHARLOTTE S

100 W Cypress Creek Rd Ste 1045

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309-2191

Defendant Attorney

RUDY JOHN F 3

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

01/31/2020: MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

03/06/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

02/05/2020: NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COVER SHEET

01/31/2020: COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

01/31/2020: LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163756; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS; Amount: $1.03; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: DEREK COURNOYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163756; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $4.97; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: DEREK COURNOYER

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: FCL-HOMESTEAD $50001-$249999; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less