This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/14/2022 at 19:59:46 (UTC).

NANCY E CRONK

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 NANCY E CRONK was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORGAN LAUR REINMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORGAN LAUR REINMAN

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

CRONK ARTHUR J

Great Falls, MT 59404-6308

FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY

C/O Probate Recovery Systems Llc, Po Box 40

Largo, FL 33779

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Po Box 3696, Mac P6053-021

Portland, OR 97208-3696

FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION

2727 Mahan Dr

Tallahassee, FL 32308-5450

VERIZON WIRELESS

Minneapolis, MN 55425-1116

Decedents

CRONK NANCY E

Melbourne, FL 32935

CRONK NANCY

Melbourne, FL 32935

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

SHUMAN ERIK P

1795 W Nasa Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-2611

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • Docket(#28) PROOF OF SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Docket(#27) PROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Docket(#26) OBJECTION TO CLAIM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • Docket(#25) OBJECTION TO CLAIM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • Docket(#24) FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • Docket(#23) PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • Docket(#22) PROOF OF SERVICE OF INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • Docket(#21) CONFIDENTIAL INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • Docket(#20) CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • Docket(#19) PROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketASM: FORMAL ADMIN $100K-$500K; Amount: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#5) DEATH CERTIFICATE - FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#4) PETITION TO WAIVE BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#2) OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION NO FEDERAL TAX RETURN DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PROBATE; Judge: MORGAN LAUR REINMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Florida Power & Light Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHUMAN, ERIK PETER