This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/23/2022 at 10:18:34 (UTC).

MV PAVING VS TITUS LANDING

Case Summary

On 03/28/2022 MV PAVING filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against TITUS LANDING. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MV PAVING INC

Defendant

TITUS LANDING OPC FL LLC

1201 Hays St

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2683

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KALMANSON BARRY

500 N Maitland Ave, #305

Maitland, FL 32751

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

03/28/2022: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

CORRESPONDENCE

03/28/2022: CORRESPONDENCE

LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

03/28/2022: LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/28/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

03/28/2022: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

03/28/2022: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

04/06/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT

04/19/2022: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

04/19/2022: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

05/12/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

DEFAULT ENTERED

05/17/2022: DEFAULT ENTERED

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

05/18/2022: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

05/18/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

05/20/2022: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

05/20/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S221378; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 150025593; Event Description: PMT: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: $18.50; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: KALMANSON BARRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketASM: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: 18.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketASM: LIS PENDENS THREE PAGES; Amount: 13.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketASM:FORECLOSURE 50,000 OR LESS; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER REAL PROPERTY 0-$50000; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KALMANSON BARRY