Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 03/25/2020 at 08:12:55 (UTC).

MITCHELL R VS PROGRESSIVE

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 MITCHELL R filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INJURY TREATMENT SOLUTIONS

GAMIN TAMMY

MITCHELL R GREENBERG DC INC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAG ROBERT D

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

10/28/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

09/18/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

COVER SHEET

09/13/2019: COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

09/13/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/13/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/13/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

09/13/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S152231; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ROBERT DAVID HOAG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S152231; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: $55.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ROBERT DAVID HOAG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INJURY TREATMENT SOLUTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where MITCHELL R GREENBERG DC INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOAG ROBERT D