Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/08/2020 at 07:32:48 (UTC).

MITCHELL R VS PROGRESSIVE

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 MITCHELL R filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INJURY TREATMENT SOLUTIONS

MITCHELL R GREENBERG DC INC

HALL ERICA

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

C O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAG ROBERT D

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

11/22/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

11/05/2019: ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

JOINT STIPULATION

11/05/2019: JOINT STIPULATION

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

09/17/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

COVER SHEET

09/12/2019: COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

09/12/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/12/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/12/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

09/12/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JOINT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S152077; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ROBERT DAVID HOAG

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $100 - $500; Amount: 80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INJURY TREATMENT SOLUTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where MITCHELL R GREENBERG DC INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOAG ROBERT D