Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/07/2020 at 08:33:51 (UTC).

MITCHELL R VS DIRECT GEN INS

Case Summary

On 11/17/2019 MITCHELL R filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DIRECT GEN INS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INJURY TREATMENT SOLUTIONS

MITCHELL R GREENBERG DC INC

JACKSON JOURNEE

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra, 200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAG ROBERT D

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

Defendant Attorney

ALSAFEER ISAM J

1990 W New Haven Ave Ste 303

Melbourne, FL 32904-3924

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

01/28/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/28/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

11/20/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/17/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/17/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/17/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/17/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S157298; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ROBERT DAVID HOAG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S157298; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS 100 - 500; Amount: $80.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ROBERT DAVID HOAG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $100 - $500; Amount: 80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2019
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MITCHELL R GREENBERG DC INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Direct General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALSAFEER ISAM J