This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/07/2020 at 08:06:17 (UTC).

MIDLAND VS VIVIENNE WOODSTOCK

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 MIDLAND filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VIVIENNE WOODSTOCK. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

WOODSTOCK VIVIENNE

Palm Bay, FL 32909-6489

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE KRISTINA B

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408-1611

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERED

01/29/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

12/12/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

12/03/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/25/2019: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: DEF FAILED TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCR: DEF FAILED TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158292; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ABC LEGAL SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158292; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ABC LEGAL SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less