This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/20/2020 at 10:33:40 (UTC).

MIDLAND VS MEREDITH BERGMANN

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 MIDLAND filed an Other lawsuit against MEREDITH BERGMANN. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

BERGMANN MEREDITH

Cocoa Beach, FL 32931-3816

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN JOHAN

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687-0335

 

Court Documents

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

12/13/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

12/02/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158346; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158346; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY CIVIL; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less