Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/25/2021 at 23:26:11 (UTC).

MIDLAND VS LAVITTCUS EDWARDS

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 MIDLAND filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LAVITTCUS EDWARDS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687-0335

Defendant

EDWARDS LAVITTCUS SCOTT

Palm Bay, FL 32907-7212

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITZPATRICK MOLLY K

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687-0335

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

07/16/2020: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

07/16/2020: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS OR AMOUNT DUE

07/16/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS OR AMOUNT DUE

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

07/16/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

06/25/2020: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

DEFAULT ENTERED

06/16/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

03/12/2020: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

03/02/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

02/17/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/13/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/13/2020: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS OR AMOUNT DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: DEF FAILED TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCR: DEF FAILED TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S164454; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S164454; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 1501-2500; Amount: $175.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Disposition Date: 07/16/2020; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $1501-$2500; Amount: 175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN