This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/10/2020 at 18:41:31 (UTC).

MIDLAND VS AMANDA PEDDICORD

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 MIDLAND filed an Other lawsuit against AMANDA PEDDICORD. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

PEDDICORD AMANDA

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-2505

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GILLIS JEAN C

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408-1611

MOEHLE KRISTINA B

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408-1611

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERED

05/29/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED

AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

05/27/2020: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

05/27/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

05/26/2020: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

05/26/2020: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

05/26/2020: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

05/26/2020: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/10/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163325; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ABC LEGAL SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163325; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ABC LEGAL SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: COUNTY CIVIL $8001 - $15000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY CIVIL; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less