This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/11/2020 at 08:19:52 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING VS I MOLIASSA

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against I MOLIASSA. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MOLIASSA ISAAC

Cocoa, FL 32927-3306

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WESEMAN MELANIE S

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408-1611

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO APPROVE STIPULATION

01/27/2020: MOTION TO APPROVE STIPULATION

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

12/16/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

12/03/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COVER SHEET

11/25/2019: COVER SHEET

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/25/2019: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • Docket(#8) AGREEMENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • Docket(#7) ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION TO APPROVE STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158295; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ABC LEGAL SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158295; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ABC LEGAL SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 2501 - 5000; Disposition Date: 02/06/2020; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less