This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 10/11/2021 at 10:41:18 (UTC).

MICHAEL BAUER VS TOWER HILL

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 MICHAEL BAUER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TOWER HILL. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAUER MICHAEL

BAUER SAMANTHA

Defendant

TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Insureance Commissioner, 200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CIOCCHETTI MICHAEL

125 N Ridgewood Ave Ste 100

Daytona Beach, FL 32114-3280

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

08/10/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

06/17/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/09/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/09/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/09/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

06/09/2021: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

COVER SHEET

06/09/2021: COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S197451; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 128377277; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: CIOCCHETTI MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S197451; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 128377277; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: CIOCCHETTI MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Disposition Date: 08/10/2021; Disposition Description: DISMISS BEFORE HRG-SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docket(#3) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tower Hill SIgnature Insurance Company is a litigant