This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/17/2022 at 23:12:21 (UTC).

MERCEDES-BENZ VS DICKS AUTO

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 MERCEDES-BENZ filed an Other lawsuit against DICKS AUTO. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS JAMES BROWN and RHONDA E. BABB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

RHONDA E. BABB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC

Defendants

DICKS AUTO REPAIR TOWING LLC

6940 Sonny Dale Dr, Registered Agent Dana L Stor

Melbourne, FL 32904-2257

DICKS AUTO REPAIR

6940 Sonny Dale Dr, Registered Agent Dana L Stor

Melbourne, FL 32904-2257

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILSON PAUL E

1776 N Pine Island Rd Ste 308

Plantation, FL 33332-2523

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

01/06/2022: COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

01/06/2022: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/06/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

01/07/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

02/03/2022: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

03/30/2022: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY COURT

04/19/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY COURT

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS OR AMOUNT DUE

04/28/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS OR AMOUNT DUE

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/02/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 01:30 PM; Event Description: CAL:HEARING; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; User: ajg90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS OR AMOUNT DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S211686; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 141491059; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: WILSON PAUL E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S211686; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 141491059; Event Description: PMT: CO CIVIL $15001 - $30000; Amount: $400.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: WILSON PAUL E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • Docket(#4) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: COUNTY CIVIL $15001 - $30000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketASM: CO CIVIL $15001 - $30000; Amount: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY CIVIL; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS SERVICER FOR DAIMLER TRUST A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wilson, Paul E