This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/19/2020 at 14:31:02 (UTC).

MEMORIAL VS R HERNANDEZRODRIGU

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 MEMORIAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against R HERNANDEZRODRIGU. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEMORIAL HOSPITAL SALEM CO

1980 Michigan Ave, Co Lotan Associates Pa

Cocoa, FL 32922-5729

Defendant

HERNANDEZRODRIQUEZ RENE

Palm Bay, FL 32909-6644

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE TROY R

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922-5729

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

02/20/2020: SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

02/06/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163607; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: TROY R LOTANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163607; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS $5001-$8000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: TROY R LOTANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $5001-$8000; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less