This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 02/27/2021 at 14:59:16 (UTC).

MARY HYDE VS REALTY INCOME

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 MARY HYDE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against REALTY INCOME. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HYDE MARY

Defendants

REALTY INCOME PROPERTIES INC

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION

Ct Corporation, 1200 S Pine Island Rd

Plantation, FL 33324-4469

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY

1200 South Pine Island Rd

Tallahassee, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATSON JOHN ALLAN

1000 Legion Pl Ste 1000

Orlando, FL 32801-1025

Defendant Attorneys

MCDONOUGH SEAN M

111 N Orange Ave Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

SPETSAS NICHOLAS J

1900 Summit Tower Boulevard, Tower Place Suite 400

Orlando, FL 32810

BELL BRADLEY S

407 N Howard Ave Ste 201

Tampa, FL 33606-1575

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

08/11/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

07/29/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

07/29/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/27/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/27/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

07/27/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/27/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/27/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COVER SHEET

07/27/2020: COVER SHEET

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/13/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR COPIES

01/08/2021: REQUEST FOR COPIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/04/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

12/18/2020: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/11/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/11/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

PRIVILEGE LOG

10/09/2020: PRIVILEGE LOG

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/16/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/11/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 10:45 AM; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REALTY INCOME PROPERTIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION is a litigant