This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/08/2020 at 08:47:04 (UTC).

MARTA GALVEZ VS ALLSTATE

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 MARTA GALVEZ filed an Other lawsuit against ALLSTATE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES H EARP. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES H EARP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALVEZ MARTA

Defendants

ORTIZ TRINIDAD

Palm Bay, FL 32907-9455

ALLSTATE FIRE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Chief Financial Officer, 200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASCONAPE JUAN

7111 Fairway Dr Ste 105

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418-4205

Defendant Attorneys

GALLAGHER MICHAEL JOHN

189 S Orange Ave Ste 1430

Orlando, FL 32801-3258

TAJAK KRISTEN A

44 W Flagler St Fl 25

Miami, FL 33130-1817

LENTINI MICHAEL R

390 N Orange Ave Ste 895

Orlando, FL 32801-1635

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

11/25/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

11/25/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

11/25/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

11/25/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

11/25/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

11/25/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/09/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

10/09/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/09/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

11/25/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

11/25/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

11/25/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

11/25/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/08/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/08/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

10/28/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/09/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

10/09/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • Docket(#73) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • Docket(#72) AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: JAMES H EARP; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less