Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/17/2020 at 13:00:25 (UTC).

MANISHA GASTON VS CHAMPION

Case Summary

On 10/24/2017 MANISHA GASTON filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against CHAMPION. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOMPEROUSSE MARIE

GASTON MANISHA

DUVELSSAINT JESSICA

Defendant

CHAMPION AUTOMOTIVE CARE PLUS LLC

6249 Babcock St Se

Palm Bay, FL 32909-3904

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELTON R FRANK II

201 S Orange Ave Ste 1500

Orlando, FL 32801-3482

Defendant Attorneys

COSBY JEFFREY C

301 Se Ocean Blvd, Ste 205

Stuart, FL 34994-

POPRAWSKI SEBASTIAN KAZIMIERZ

301 Se Ocean Blvd Ste 205

Stuart, FL 34994-2209

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

09/06/2019: NOTICE OF MEDIATION

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

09/12/2018: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/05/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

08/14/2018: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

08/02/2018: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

07/27/2018: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

06/28/2018: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

04/26/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

04/17/2018: REQUEST FOR COPIES

ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

01/29/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

01/28/2020: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES

08/06/2018: NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

06/28/2018: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

05/30/2018: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

05/16/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

05/10/2018: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

04/27/2018: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/24/2017: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT COMPLETE AGREEMENT OR SETTLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Docket(#73) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:30 AM; Judge: PRIVATE CIRCUIT CIV MEDIATION; Matter Type: PRIVATE CIRCUIT CIV MEDIATION; Result: CR: MEDIATION HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketCR: MEDIATION HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketCAL:PRIVATE CIRCUIT MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Docket(#72) NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2017
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S103228; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ROBERT F MELTON II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: PRODUCTS LIABILITY; Disposition Date: 01/28/2020; Disposition Description: DISMISS BEFORE HRG-MEDIATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PRODUCTS LIABILITY; Judge: TONYA B. RAINWATER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer POPRAWSKI SEBASTIAN KAZIMIERZ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COSBY JEFFREY C