This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/08/2020 at 07:02:32 (UTC).

MALABAR COVE VS LAURA L SMITH

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 MALABAR COVE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against LAURA L SMITH. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MALABAR COVE II LTD

MALABAR COVE II APARTMENTS

Defendant

SMITH LAURA L

Palm Bay, FL 32908-3329

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCABE WILLIAM J

1250 S Us Highway 17 92 Ste 210

Longwood, FL 32750-5712

 

Court Documents

ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO DISBURSE FUNDS

01/04/2020: ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO DISBURSE FUNDS

ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

01/04/2020: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT OR STIPULATION

12/30/2019: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT OR STIPULATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

12/30/2019: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/20/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

12/02/2019: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

12/06/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

12/02/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/25/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 02:00 PM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketDSB: REFUND BOND; Amount: 2336.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • BondBonds: Sequence Number: 4; Control Number: 282159; Transaction Type: BOND REFUND; Transaction Amount: $0.00; Transaction Balance: $2,336.80; Fee Amount: $0.00; Interest Amount: $0.00; Bond Status: RELEASED; Payee Name: MALABAR COVE II LTD; Payee Address1: C/O BILL MCCABE ESQ; Payee Address2: 1250 S US HIGHWAY 17-92 STE210; Payee City State Zip: LONGWOOD FL 327505712; Check Amount: $2,336.80; Check Date: 01/08/2020; Check Number: 818115

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO DISBURSE FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT OR STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S157932; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: WILLIAM J MCCABE PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S157932; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: EVICTION FILING FEE; Amount: $185.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: WILLIAM J MCCABE PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: EVICTION-POSSESSION ONLY; Disposition Date: 12/30/2019; Disposition Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: EVICTION FILING FEE; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY EVICTION; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less