This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/26/2020 at 11:52:27 (UTC).

MAL COVE VS NORMALIZ CARBONELL

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 MAL COVE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against NORMALIZ CARBONELL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MALABAR COVE II LTD

MALABAR COVE II APARTMENTS

Defendant

CARBONELL NORMALIZ

Palm Bay, FL 32908-3328

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCABE WILLIAM J

1250 S Us Highway 17 92 Ste 210

Longwood, FL 32750-5712

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED

01/21/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

01/08/2020: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

01/04/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/04/2020: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

12/17/2019: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

12/10/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

12/09/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

MOTION FOR EXTENSION

12/05/2019: MOTION FOR EXTENSION

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

12/06/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

12/02/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY AND PROPER VENUE

11/26/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY AND PROPER VENUE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/25/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S157930; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: EVICTION FILING FEE; Amount: $185.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: WILLIAM J MCCABE PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY AND PROPER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: EVICTION-POSSESSION ONLY; Disposition Date: 01/04/2020; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: EVICTION FILING FEE; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY EVICTION; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less