This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 11/28/2020 at 02:13:16 (UTC).

M WELBORNHEREFORD VS R HEREFOR

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 M WELBORNHEREFORD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against R HEREFOR. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTEN SMITH-RODRIGUEZ and BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KRISTEN SMITH-RODRIGUEZ

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Petitioners

WELBORNHEREFORD MELISSA ANNE

Rockledge, FL 32955

HEREFORD ROBERT SYDNEY

Cocoa, FL 32926-4312

WELBORN MELISSA ANNE

Rockledge, FL 32955-4107

WELBORN HEREFORD MELISSA ANNE

Rockledge, FL 32955-4107

Respondent and Petitioner

HEREFORD ROBERT SYDNEY

Cocoa, FL 32926-4312

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketVITAL STATISTIC FORM GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#12) FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:30 AM; Judge: KRISTEN SMITH-RODRIGUEZ; Matter Type: SIMPLIFIED DOM HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • Docket(#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCAL:SIMPLIFIED DOM HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE SMITH-RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION; Disposition Date: 10/20/2020; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#6) DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS (FOUND INDIGENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCIR FAM ORIG-INDIGENT NO FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less