This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/05/2020 at 00:53:17 (UTC).

M VERDEROSA VS M VON BUELOW

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 M VERDEROSA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against M VON BUELOW. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO and MEDIATION COUNTY CIVIL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

MEDIATION COUNTY CIVIL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VERDEROSA MARY JANE

Melbourne, FL 32940-1299

Defendants

VON BUELOW MICHAEL

Rockledge, FL 32955-5156

VON BUELOW DIANE

Rockledge, FL 32955-5156

 

Court Documents

MEDIATION CONFERENCE REPORT COMPLETE AGREEMENT

07/15/2020: MEDIATION CONFERENCE REPORT COMPLETE AGREEMENT

ORDER SETTING MEDIATION CONFERENCE

06/24/2020: ORDER SETTING MEDIATION CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION

06/24/2020: NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION

06/24/2020: NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

03/16/2020: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

03/12/2020: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

02/12/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

02/12/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/31/2020: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) ISSUED

01/31/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) ISSUED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) ISSUED

01/31/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: MEDIATION COUNTY CIVIL; Matter Type: MEDIATION COUNTY CIVIL; Result: CR: MEDIATION HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEDIATION CONFERENCE REPORT COMPLETE AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCR: MEDIATION HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCAL:MEDIATION CIRCUIT CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: B204450; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: VERDEROSA MARY JANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: B204450; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ENVELOPE AND POSTAGE; Amount: $0.68; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: VERDEROSA MARY JANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ENVELOPE AND POSTAGE; Amount: 0.68

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less