This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/28/2023 at 01:06:57 (UTC).

M TRUJILLO VS UNIVERSAL PROP

Case Summary

On 10/17/2022 M TRUJILLO filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROP. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRUJILLO MICHAEL

TRUJILLO CHRISTINE

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERGES OTTO

Defendant Attorneys

MCDONALD MICHAEL A

LEVINS ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/17/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/17/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/17/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGATORIES

10/17/2022: NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/17/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/07/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

11/28/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/06/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/02/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2023
  • HearingCourt Schedule; Court Time: 09:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:HEARING; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; User: spp66

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S233665; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 159366786; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: BERGES OTTO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S233665; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 159366786; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: BERGES OTTO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • Docket(#6) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2022
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: INSURANCE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: INSURANCE CLAIM; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less