Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/15/2020 at 10:55:24 (UTC).

M R GREENBERG VS PERMANENT GEN

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 M R GREENBERG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PERMANENT GEN. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INJURY TREATMENT SOLUTIONS

MITCHELL R GREENBERG DC INC

940 S Harbor City Blvd, C/O Morgan Morgan Pa

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

COSTA ANTHONY

Defendant

PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION

C/O Ra Florida Chief Financial Officer, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAG ROBERT D

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

Defendant Attorney

DUBBERT BRET E

255 S Orange Ave Ste 900

Orlando, FL 32801-3454

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

04/09/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/13/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

01/06/2020: ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

JOINT STIPULATION

01/06/2020: JOINT STIPULATION

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

01/03/2020: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/03/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY MAIL

11/18/2019: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY MAIL

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

11/13/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

COVER SHEET

11/12/2019: COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/12/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/12/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/12/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/12/2019: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • Docket(#18) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INJURY TREATMENT SOLUTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where Permanent General Assurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dubbert, Bret E