Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/09/2021 at 10:29:09 (UTC).

M PERRON VS FIRST PROTECTIVE

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 M PERRON filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FIRST PROTECTIVE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURT JACOBUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURT JACOBUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PERRON LORENA

PERRON MATTHEW

Defendants

FRONTLINE INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

FIRST PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARKATSELOS TIM

2601 E Oakland Park Blvd Ste 503

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33306-1617

Defendant Attorney

GUTTERMAN MARC J

200 E Broward Blvd Ste 1630

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-1949

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/03/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/03/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY UPON LAND

05/03/2021: REQUEST FOR ENTRY UPON LAND

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

04/15/2021: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

03/30/2021: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/30/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

03/16/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

COVER SHEET

03/10/2021: COVER SHEET

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/10/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/10/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/10/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

03/10/2021: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REQUEST FOR ENTRY UPON LAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#10) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: CURT JACOBUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRONTLINE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gutterman, Marc Jason