Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 02/27/2021 at 14:20:18 (UTC).

M D REED VS REALTY INCOME

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 M D REED filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against REALTY INCOME. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REED MARY D

Defendants

REALTY INCOME PROPERTIES INC

1201 Hays St, Corporation Service Company Ra

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2699

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION

Ct Corporation, 1200 S Pine Island Rd

Plantation, FL 33324-4469

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY

Ct Corporation, 1200 S Pine Island Rd

Plantation, FL 33324-4413

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATSON JOHN ALLAN

1000 Legion Pl Ste 1000

Orlando, FL 32801-1025

Defendant Attorneys

SPETSAS NICHOLAS J

1900 Summit Tower Boulevard, Tower Place Suite 400

Orlando, FL 32810

BELL BRADLEY S

407 N Howard Ave Ste 201

Tampa, FL 33606-1575

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

07/31/2020: NOTICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

07/27/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/24/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

07/24/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/24/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COVER SHEET

07/24/2020: COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/19/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

12/18/2020: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

12/15/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/10/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

10/27/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/23/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/22/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/22/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/22/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

10/22/2020: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

INTERROGATORIES

07/24/2020: INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/24/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#15) MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDSB: REFUND; Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S180855; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: REFUND; Amount: $50.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: NICHOLAS JOSEPH SPETSAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S180854; Party: D 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: NICHOLAS JOSEPH SPETSAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S180854; Party: D 1; Event Description: PMT: CIR CROSS-COUNTER-3RD PTY; Amount: $395.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: NICHOLAS JOSEPH SPETSAS

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REALTY INCOME PROPERTIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Watson, John A