This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 12/04/2022 at 11:40:24 (UTC).

M BHULA VS R PATEL

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 M BHULA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against R PATEL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BHULA MEENA

Defendants

PATEL RAMESHBHAI

TITUSVILLE SURGICAL ASSOCATES

NORTH BREVARD COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

PARRISH MEDICAL CENTER

TAIVAL TANYA ITANI

Titusville, FL 32796-2142

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEREGOVICH ANDRES I

210 N Mills Ave

Orlando, FL 32801-2114

Defendant Attorneys

MIRELMAN ALAN

1063 Maitland Center Commons Blvd

Maitland, FL 32751-7436

DOYLE DAVID O JR

485 N Keller Road #401

Maitland, FL 32751

LEA GORDON

200 S Andrews Ave Ste 900

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-2068

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

04/01/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/20/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/02/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/19/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

04/11/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

04/11/2022: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/19/2022: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

09/27/2022: MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/15/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/18/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2023
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 11:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:HEARING; Court Room Description: TITUSVILLE HISTORIC COURTHOUSE; Judge Name: GEORGE T PAULK; User: ajg90

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 09:30 AM; Event Description: CAL:HEARING; Court Room Description: TITUSVILLE HISTORIC COURTHOUSE; Judge Name: GEORGE T PAULK; User: ajg90

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • Docket(#40) MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S217873; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 146892448; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: BEREGOVICH ANDRES I

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: MEDICAL MAL PRACTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH BREVARD COUNTY HOSPITIAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where PARRISH MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEREGOVICH ANDRES I