This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 22:35:18 (UTC).

LVNV VS FARRREN CLEARY

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 LVNV filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FARRREN CLEARY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

CLEARY FARREN

Titusville, FL 32780-3255

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HINES MICHELLE KIM

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795-2289

SCHERR HAROLD E

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF NON JURY TRIAL

05/28/2020: ORDER OF NON JURY TRIAL

ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE BY PHONE

05/14/2020: ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE BY PHONE

MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

05/06/2020: MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

04/09/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

02/26/2020: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

01/13/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

01/03/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/27/2019: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/27/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 02:30 PM; Event Description: CAL:NON JURY TRIAL; Court Room Description: TITUSVILLE HISTORIC COURTHOUSE; Judge Name: MICHELLE A BAKER; User: mec84

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCAL:NON JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: NON JURY TRIAL; Result: CR: NON JURY TRIAL CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCR: NON JURY TRIAL CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCAL:NON JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF NON JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE BY PHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 02:00 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: NON JURY TRIAL; Result: CR: NON JURY TRIAL CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCR: NON JURY TRIAL CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S160624; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: HAROLD EARL SCHERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S160624; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS 1001 < 1500; Amount: $175.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: HAROLD EARL SCHERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 1001 - 1500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS 1001 < 1500; Amount: 175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less