Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 03/13/2020 at 07:14:27 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING VS SHERRY EVERETT

Case Summary

On 09/05/2019 LVNV FUNDING filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SHERRY EVERETT. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Po Box 952289, C/O Mandarich Law Group Llp

Lake Mary, FL 32795-2289

Defendant

EVERETT SHERRY L DOC Number - A20576

Rockledge, FL 32955-2044

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HINES MICHELLE KIM

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795-2289

Defendant Attorney

HOLLAND DAVID N

3639 Cortez Rd W Ste 130

Bradenton, FL 34210-3157

 

Court Documents

NOTICE CHANGING LAW FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS

03/06/2020: NOTICE CHANGING LAW FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

11/10/2019: ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

JOINT STIPULATION

11/06/2019: JOINT STIPULATION

JOINT STIPULATION

10/29/2019: JOINT STIPULATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

10/29/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

09/28/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

09/12/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/05/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/05/2019: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE CHANGING LAW FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • Docket(#7) ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JOINT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JOINT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S151738; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: HAROLD EARL SCHERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S151738; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 1501-2500; Amount: $175.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: HAROLD EARL SCHERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: OTHER NEGLIGENCE $1501 - $2500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $1501-$2500; Amount: 175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Holland, David N