This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 09/07/2020 at 09:04:43 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING VS N SEARLESS

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 LVNV FUNDING filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against N SEARLESS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SEARLES NICOLE

Cape Canaveral, FL 32920-2737

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HINES MICHELLE KIM

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795-2289

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT STIPULATION

03/10/2020: PAYMENT STIPULATION

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

02/07/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

02/05/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/31/2020: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: MEDIATION HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCR: MEDIATION HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163373; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: HAROLD EARL SCHERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163373; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: HAROLD EARL SCHERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 2501 - 5000; Disposition Date: 03/10/2020; Disposition Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less