This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/30/2020 at 14:41:34 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING VS J VALLECER

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 LVNV FUNDING filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against J VALLECER. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

VALLECER JOSEPH

Palm Bay, FL 32909-3880

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HINES MICHELLE KIM

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795-2289

Defendant Attorney

CASTELLANOS J NICHOLAS

3639 Cortez Rd W Ste 130

Bradenton, FL 34210-3157

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

05/18/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

ORDER CANCELLING HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

04/20/2020: ORDER CANCELLING HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

04/07/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

02/13/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

02/05/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/31/2020: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER CANCELLING HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163372; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: HAROLD EARL SCHERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163372; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: HAROLD EARL SCHERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Disposition Date: 05/18/2020; Disposition Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less