This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 01/18/2023 at 14:17:14 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING VS ANGELA WILLEKE

Case Summary

On 03/12/2022 LVNV FUNDING filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANGELA WILLEKE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

6801 S Cimarron Rd

Las Vegas, NV 89113-2273

Defendant

WILLEKE ANGELA

Titusville, FL 32780-9115

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/12/2022: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/12/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

03/14/2022: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

03/29/2022: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

DEFAULT ENTERED

05/18/2022: DEFAULT ENTERED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

06/08/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

06/08/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEFAULT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • HearingPast Court Schedule; Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: DEF FAILED TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCR: DEF FAILED TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S216468; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 145593183; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ROEBUCK ANDREA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S216468; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 145593183; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ROEBUCK ANDREA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2022
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 2501 - 5000; Disposition Date: 06/08/2022; Disposition Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2022
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: 300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less