This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/05/2020 at 10:50:22 (UTC).

LVNV FUND VS DARRELL HOOVER

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 LVNV FUND filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DARRELL HOOVER. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

HOOVER DARRELL

Cocoa, FL 32922-7890

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HINES MICHELLE KIM

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795-2289

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

12/21/2019: SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

12/02/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/25/2019: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158325; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: HAROLD EARL SCHERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158325; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: HAROLD EARL SCHERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less