This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/20/2020 at 06:05:33 (UTC).

LUIS GARCIA VS CURTIS ZOPP

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 LUIS GARCIA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CURTIS ZOPP. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA LUIS

Defendant

ZOPP CURTIS

Merritt Island, FL 32953-4529

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAIG BONNIE ELLEN

101 S Courtenay Pkwy

Merritt Island, FL 32952

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED

01/17/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

01/08/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

01/07/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

DEFAULT ENTERED

12/17/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

12/09/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

12/04/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

12/02/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

11/26/2019: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/25/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketPMT: REFUND; Amount: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketDSB: REFUND; Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S157857; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: EVICTION FILING FEE; Amount: $185.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: LAW OFFICE BONNIE HAIG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: EVICTION-POSSESSION ONLY; Disposition Date: 01/07/2020; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: EVICTION FILING FEE; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY EVICTION; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less