This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 01/10/2022 at 10:44:50 (UTC).

LOUIE CELDON HUMAN

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 LOUIE CELDON HUMAN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORGAN LAUR REINMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORGAN LAUR REINMAN

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

HUMAN FLORA K

Mims, FL 32754-5706

GOLDEN FLORA KATHLEEN

Mims, FL 32754-5706

Decedents

HUMAN LOUIE CELDON

Mims, FL 32754-5706

HUMAN LOUIE C

Mims, FL 32754-5706

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

FIELD SHANNAN

The Law Office Of Shannan M Field Pa1135 S Washington Ave Ste A

Titusville, FL 32780-8401

Other Attorneys

SHANNAN M FIELD PA

1135 S Washington Ave Ste A

Titusville, FL 32780-8401

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • Docket(#18) STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#17) AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • Docket(#15) CONFIDENTIAL INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#14) PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE TO CREDITORS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docket(#10) LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketASM: FORMAL ADMIN $100K-$500K; Amount: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Docket(#5) OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Docket(#3) PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION NO FEDERAL TAX RETURN DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PROBATE; Judge: MORGAN LAUR REINMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: SAFEKEEPING WILL; Disposition Date: 07/26/2021; Disposition Description: ADMIN PROCEEDING DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECEIPT FOR SAFEKEEPING WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNON SRS FILING DISPO UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNON SRS FILING ACTION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Docket(#1) WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIELD SHANNAN