This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/17/2022 at 07:10:08 (UTC).

LOANCARE LLC VS JAN GAUTHIER

Case Summary

On 12/14/2021 LOANCARE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JAN GAUTHIER. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURT JACOBUS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURT JACOBUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOANCARE LLC

Defendants

GAUTHIER JAN E

Mims, FL 32754-5592

GAUTHIER MELANIE MARIE

Mims, FL 32754-5592

DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC

1201 Hays St

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2699

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS JONATHAN

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487-2853

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MASTER SUZANNE MCQUAGGE

02/16/2022: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MASTER SUZANNE MCQUAGGE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

02/16/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

02/16/2022: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF ACTION

02/03/2022: NOTICE OF ACTION

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

01/12/2022: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

01/12/2022: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

01/12/2022: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

01/12/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/14/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S214719; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 144002502; Event Description: PMT: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: $18.50; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MEISELS JONATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MASTER SUZANNE MCQUAGGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketASM: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: 18.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketNTC OF ACTION MAILED TO DEFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF NOTE IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: FCL-NON-HOMESTD 50001-249999; Judge: CURT JACOBUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc. by Caliber Home Loans Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LoanCare, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan