This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/10/2020 at 00:06:36 (UTC).

LIVE OAK HMA LLC VS E MILLER

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 LIVE OAK HMA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against E MILLER. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHANDS LIVE OAK REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922-5729

LIVE OAK HMA LLC

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922-5729

Defendant

MILLER EZRA

Palm Bay, FL 32907-7876

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE TROY R

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922-5729

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

03/18/2020: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

03/03/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

02/04/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/31/2020: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163319; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: TROY R LOTANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163319; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 1501-2500; Amount: $175.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: TROY R LOTANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: OTHER NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $1501-$2500; Amount: 175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less