This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 09:34:11 (UTC).

LISA BARRON VS RICHARD NELSON

Case Summary

On 08/29/2019 LISA BARRON filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against RICHARD NELSON. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE B. TURNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE B. TURNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAUER MARY ELIZABETH

BARRON LISA MARIE

Defendants

WEEKS PATRICIA

Cocoa, FL 32926-1829

NELSON MARJORIE

Butler, TN 37640-7451

TURNER ROBIN G

Cocoa Beach, FL 32931-2930

NELSON RICHARD

Butler, TN 37640-7451

HAPPY HOUSE REAL ESTATE LLC

30 N Brevard Ave

Cocoa Beach, FL 32931-2930

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUNTER DAVID A

7351 Office Park Pl Ste 153

Melbourne, FL 32940-8229

Defendant Attorneys

WOLFMAN DAVID J

1300 Bedford Dr Ste 103

Melbourne, FL 32940-1991

PETERS MARK S

5450 Village Dr

Rockledge, FL 32955-6569

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DISMISS

09/25/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/10/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/10/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/10/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

09/06/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

09/06/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/29/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COVER SHEET

08/29/2019: COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

08/29/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

11/05/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

10/16/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

10/16/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/02/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO DISMISS

09/25/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/10/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

09/10/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

09/06/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/29/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 11:00 AM; Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER; Matter Type: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: BUSINESS TRANSACTION; Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less