This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/19/2022 at 10:09:45 (UTC).

LIBERTY TECH VS MARK E MARTIN

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 LIBERTY TECH filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against MARK E MARTIN. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RHONDA E. BABB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RHONDA E. BABB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIBERTY TECH PROPERTIES LLC

4309 Brynwood Dr

Naples, FL 34119-8416

Defendant

MARTIN MARK E

Palm Bay, FL 32905-6011

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLUB GEOFFREY

512 N Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32935-6838

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/21/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

04/21/2022: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

04/25/2022: NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

04/25/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

04/27/2022: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • Docket(#7) CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Docket(#6) MOTION TO EXTEND TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: B211492; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CO CIVIL $15001 - $30000; Amount: $61.86; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: LAW OFFICES GEOFFREY PETER GOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: B211492; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: COUNTY REPLEVIN; Amount: $13.14; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: LAW OFFICES GEOFFREY PETER GOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: B211492; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: LAW OFFICES GEOFFREY PETER GOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S219388; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CO CIVIL $15001 - $30000; Amount: $338.14; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: GOLUB GEOFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S219388; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: COUNTY REPLEVIN; Amount: $71.86; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: GOLUB GEOFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Docket(#2) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CHAPTER 78 RPLN $15001-$30000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketASM: COUNTY REPLEVIN; Amount: 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketASM: CO CIVIL $15001 - $30000; Amount: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY REPLEVIN; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLUB GEOFFREY