This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 11/21/2021 at 09:18:22 (UTC).

LEST GROUP LLC VS E MESSER

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 LEST GROUP LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against E MESSER. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEST GROUP LLC

Defendants

MESSER EMORY R

Cocoa, FL 32927-4805

MESSER EMORY

Cocoa, FL 32927-4805

SEMENTO HARRY F

Cocoa, FL 32927-4805

ACCREDITED SURETY CASUALTY COMPANY INC

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

MESSER JOANN M

Cocoa, FL 32927-4805

MONCRIEF BAIL BONDS INC

3910 S John Young Pkwy

Orlando, FL 32839-9209

JPA TAX CERT LLC

531 Sonoma Isles Cir

Jupiter, FL 33478-5500

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WICKERSHAM CHRISTOPHER W J

2720 Park St Ste 205

Jacksonville, FL 32205-7645

 

Court Documents

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

10/14/2021: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

10/14/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

10/14/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

10/12/2021: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/12/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/12/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/12/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

10/14/2021: NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/12/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: B209782; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS; Amount: $0.38; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: C W WICKERSHAM JR PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: B209782; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $4.62; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: C W WICKERSHAM JR PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S206416; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT:FORECLOSURE 50,000 OR LESS; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHAMIKA BOSWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketASM:FORECLOSURE 50,000 OR LESS; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER REAL PROPERTY 0-$50000; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WICKERSHAM CHRISTOPHER W J