This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 09/21/2022 at 00:17:29 (UTC).

LAUREN PECK VS HOOTERS

Case Summary

On 02/10/2022 LAUREN PECK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOOTERS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARD WAYBURN ELSIE JR ESTATE

Defendants

HOOTERS AMERICA LLC

1200 S Pine Island Rd Ste 100

Plantation, FL 33324-4469

HOA RESTAURANT HOLDER LLC

1200 South Pine Island Rd, C/O Ct Corporation System

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33324

HOOTERS MELBOURNE

Plantation, FL 33324-4469

DAVIS ARIEL

Plantation, FL 33324-4469

Not Yet Classified

PECK LAUREN

CHRISTIE CARRIE L

Atlanta, GA 30303-1285

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorney

WATSON JOHN ALLAN

1000 Legion Pl Ste 1000

Orlando, FL 32801-1025

Defendant Attorneys

CHRISTIE CARRIE L

285 Peachtree Center Ave Ne Ste 1650

Atlanta, GA 30303-1285

BEASLEY QUINTON R

285 Peachtree Center Ave Ne Ste 1650

Atlanta, GA 30303-1285

GAGAIN EDWARD F III

201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1100

Tampa, FL 33602-5827

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/15/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/15/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/15/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/15/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/07/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/07/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/07/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

02/10/2022: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

02/10/2022: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

09/14/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S)

09/12/2022: PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S)

PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S)

09/12/2022: PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S)

PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S)

09/12/2022: PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S)

PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S)

09/12/2022: PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S)

PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S)

09/12/2022: PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S)

PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S)

09/12/2022: PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S)

PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S)

09/12/2022: PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S)

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2022
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 02:15 PM; Event Description: CAL:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: DAVID DUGAN; User: spp66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCAL:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 01:30 PM; Event Description: CAL:PRIVATE CIRCUIT MEDIATION; Court Room Description: AS ORDERED BY THE COURT; User: ajg90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCAL:PRIVATE CIRCUIT MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER NEGLIGENCE; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: CIRCUIT CASE TYPE CHANGE ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOA RESTAURANT HOLDER, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HOOTERS AMERICA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Watson, John A