Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/29/2020 at 10:31:44 (UTC).

LAPINE FAMILY VS USAA GENERAL

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 LAPINE FAMILY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against USAA GENERAL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SMITH WILLIE

LAPINE FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC INC

Defendant

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

C O Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra, 200 East Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAG ROBERT D

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

Defendant Attorney

MELCHIORRE KATY M

3659 Maguire Blvd Ste 151

Orlando, FL 32803-3028

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

02/19/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE

02/13/2020: NOTICE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/13/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/23/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/23/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

11/21/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/20/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/20/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/20/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/20/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketPTC CANCELLED PER AO 19-40-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $1501-$2500; Amount: 175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAPINE FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC INC is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELCHIORRE KATY M